skip to content

Ting, Yuk Joseph

CPSO#: 97237

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2012 to 24 Feb 2012
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013