skip to content

Ting, David

CPSO#: 22704

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1997