skip to content

Rourke, Timothy Wade

CPSO#: 58412

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 14 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. Rourke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 28 2016
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

All requests for medical records should be faxed to 519-397-5497.
Date Received: 26 Nov 2018


Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Rourke by: telephone: 613-845-0200, by fax: 613-845-0161, or by e-mail: [email protected]
Date Received: 09 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 13 Oct 2021
Summary:

On November 5, 2020 allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Rourke were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now referred to as the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.

The Notice of Hearing alleged Dr. Rourke had engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The OPSDT heard the matter on October 13, 2021 by videoconference. Counsel for both the College and Dr. Rourke attended the hearing.

On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability) and after hearing submissions of both counsel, the OPSDT found Dr. Rourke committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Disposition

On October 13, 2021, the OPSDT issued its Order directing that:

-Dr. Rourke attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
-The Registrar suspend Dr. Rourke’s certificate of registration for ten months commencing October 14, 2021;
-The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rourke’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order;
-Dr. Rourke pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00.

The OPSDT’s reasons for decision in this case were released on November 18, 2021 and are available to view below.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 13, 2021, by videoconference