skip to content

Timol, Shehnaz

CPSO#: 87223

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3155 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2G2
Phone: 416 267-3191
Fax: 1 855 400 0729 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Almakki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Timol ( CPSO# 87223 )
Dr. N. Almakki ( CPSO# 90811 )

Business Address:
202 - 3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P6
Phone Number: (416) 792-0836

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEHNAZ TIMOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009