Timmons, Matthew (CPSO#: 98861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2015

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 Talbot St W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: 5193262373
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Timmons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Timmons ( CPSO# 98861 )

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 16, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 18, 2017, Timmins and District Hospital (TADH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospital Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that on December 15, 2017, Dr. Matthew Timmons withdrew his 2018 application for privileges at TADH.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW TIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Matthew Timmons to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 15, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Timmons engaged in professional misconduct by behaving unprofessionally in his anaesthesiology and emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, the Chief of Staff at Erie Shores Healthcare will provide periodic reports to the College about Dr. Timmons’s conduct, communication, professionalism, and clinical practice.