skip to content

Tilsworth, Richard Hartson

CPSO#: 26873

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard H. Tilsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 395 Carrie St Strathroy ON N1G 3J4
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2019