skip to content

Tillmann, Bourke William

CPSO#: 92916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2895
Fax: (416) 480-4999 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B.W. Tillmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Tillmann ( CPSO# 92916 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D1-08
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BOURKE WILLIAM TILLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILLMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015