skip to content

Tihal, Hirawan

CPSO#: 30852

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tihal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Academy of Medicine 206 - 1 Young St Hamilton, ON L8N 1T8
Date Received: 15 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2018