skip to content

Czilli, Tiffany

CPSO#: 95814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jun 2024

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 3T2
Phone: 519-944-4449
Fax: 226-674-0778 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Czilli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Czilli ( CPSO# 95814 )

Business Address:
1210 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3Z5
Phone Number: (519) 944-4449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 25 Mar 2023
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 25 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Jun 2024 Active
 As from June 13th, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Tiffany Czilli in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Czilli to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

 UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. TIFFANY CZILLI
("Dr. Czilli")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
"IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Czilli, certificate of registration number 95814, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-408998-X2B4R0 (the "Investigation") into my practice, including my telemedicine and delegation practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Practice Restrictions

(a)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake that I will not engage in the delegation of controlled acts to, or supervision of, unregulated health professionals through telemedicine.

(6)	Posting a Sign

(a)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix "A". For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Czilli must not engage in delegation to, or supervision of, unregulated health professionals through telemedicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca". 
(b)	I Dr. Czilli, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." 
(c)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
(d)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
(e)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).

(7)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:            
1.	Delegation of Controlled Acts, College Policy;
2.	Advice to the Profession - Delegation of Controlled Acts, College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario; 
3.	Virtual Care, College Policy;
4.	Advice to the Profession: Virtual Care, College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

(b)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.  

(8)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Czilli, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b)	I, Dr. Czilli, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(c)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(11)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(14)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Czilli, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Czilli's practice, including her telemedicine and delegation practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Czilli will not engage in delegation to, or supervision of, unregulated health professionals through telemedicine.
Dr. Czilli shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Czilli must not engage in delegation to, or supervision of, unregulated health professionals through telemedicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
Dr. Czilli will engage in professional education in delegation and virtual care.

D.	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. Czilli, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Czilli, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. Czilli, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 24 Mar 2023
Summary:

On March 24, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Czilli committed professional misconduct in that the governing body of another health profession (the Ontario College of Pharmacists) found that she committed an act of professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct under s. 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or as defined in the regulations. The Tribunal also found that Dr. Czilli engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Czilli attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Czilli’s certificate of registration for 12 months commencing March 25, 2023;
3. Dr. Czilli pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 24, 2023.
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2023-03-24

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 13, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tiffany Czilli to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 13th, 2024:
 
Dr. Czilli will not engage in delegation to, or supervision of, unregulated health professionals through telemedicine.

Dr. Czilli shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Czilli must not engage in delegation to, or supervision of, unregulated health professionals through telemedicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Dr. Czilli will engage in professional education in delegation and virtual care.

 

Source: Canadian Medical Regulatory Authorities
Active Date: October 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The following are disciplinary findings made by other regulatory bodies against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On October 21, 2020, the Discipline Committee of the Ontario College of Pharmacists made findings of professional misconduct against Tiffany Czilli including, among other things, falsification of pharmacy records, signing or issuing in her professional capacity a document that she knew contained a false or misleading statement, submission of an account or charges for services that she knew was a false or misleading statement, and failure to keep required records. The Discipline Committee ordered the following: (a) that Dr. Czilli successfully complete the ProBE program, (b) suspension of Dr. Czilli’s pharmacist certificate for a period of 11-12 months (depending on completion of the ProBE program), (c) that Dr. Czilli is prohibited for a period of 3 years from acting as a designated manager of any pharmacy and from having a proprietary interest in any pharmacy, and (d) that Dr. Czilli be reprimanded.