skip to content

Tierney, Sarah Lynn

CPSO#: 99504

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue, Suite B312
Ottawa ON  K1Y4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN TIERNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIERNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018