skip to content

Tidd, Christopher Mark

CPSO#: 85547

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Tidd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:06 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017