skip to content

Ticktin, Stephen Jan

CPSO#: 30138

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
10 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may email Dr. Ticktin at [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Apr 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2021