skip to content

Tice, Andrew Douglas William

CPSO#: 95797

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 3267
Fax: 613-738-4840 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Tice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tice ( CPSO# 95797 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 219-6848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DOUGLAS WILLIAM TICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2018