skip to content

Thyagu, Santhosh

CPSO#: 89340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Haematology/Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5706
Fax: (416) 946-4407 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Santhosh Thyagu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thyagu ( CPSO# 89340 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Haematology/Oncology
Suite 5-303D
610 University Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (647) 865-1539


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective:13 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Santhosh Thyagu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Medical  Oncology  and  Hematology  ,  University of
                        Toronto, in which Dr. Thyagu holds an academic appointment  at  the
                        rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Thyagu no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.