skip to content

Thwin, Noreen

CPSO#: 89866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English

Education:Insitute of Medicine I, Rangoon, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-9382
Fax: (705) 746-6901 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Thwin ( CPSO# 89866 )

Business Address:
Medicine Associates Clinic
60 Bowes Street
Unit 101
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-9382

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOREEN THWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THWIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010