skip to content

Thurley, Michael

CPSO#: 22589

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Apr-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005