skip to content

Thouin, Susan Katherine

CPSO#: 84635

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: Buchanan, Susan Katherine (used until: 27 Aug 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1 Kenton Dr,
Toronto ON  M2R 2H6
Canada
Phone: (647) 932-7913
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thouin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thouin ( CPSO# 84635 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
1 Kenton Drive
North York ON  M2R 2H6
Phone Number: (647) 932-7913

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN KATHERINE THOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOUIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008