skip to content

Thorsteinson, Larry Stephen

CPSO#: 27894

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
24 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2021