skip to content

Thongthai, Kanyabhorn

CPSO#: 86051

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chulalongkorn University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Apr 2007 to 27 May 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 28 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 08 Mar 2012 to 07 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 08 Mar 2013 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013