skip to content

Thomson, Margaret Evelyn

CPSO#: 96129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elisabeth Bruyère Hospital
43 Bruyère Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 4010 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thomson ( CPSO# 96129 )

Business Address:
Elizabeth Bruyere Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARGARET EVELYN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014