skip to content

Thomson, Linda Dawn

CPSO#: 30306

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Health & Long Term Care
49 Place D'Armes
Kingston ON  K7K 6S2
Phone: (613) 536-3127 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thomson and Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Thomson ( CPSO# 26504 )
Dr. L. Thomson ( CPSO# 30306 )

Business Address:
49 Place D'Armes
Kingston ON  K7K 6E1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDA DAWN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1978