skip to content

Thomson, Bruce Willard

CPSO#: 21788

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jan 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bruce Willard Thomson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Thomson engaged in professional misconduct, including sexual abuse of a patient, or is incompetent. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Thomson resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)