skip to content

Thomson, Bruce Robert

CPSO#: 25984

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 16-Jun-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2397 Stoney Lake Island 18 Woodview, ON K0L 3E0
Instructions: Please send your request in writing to Dr. Thomson and include your name, address and contact information.
Date Received: 30 Jan 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013