Thomson, Benjamin Andrew Ivon (CPSO#: 99594)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2013 to 20 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2013