skip to content

Thompson, Stephen Robert

CPSO#: 96615

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
925 Union Street
Suite 3
Bangor ME  04401
United States
Phone: (207) 973-9980
Fax: (207) 973-7515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011 Active
 Dr.  Stephen Robert Thompson may practise medicine independently in Orthopaedic
            Surgery, only.