skip to content

Thompson, Michael George Gaius

CPSO#: 22370

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 Feb 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 Feb 1993

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Oct 1991
Summary:

 In October 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Thompson guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Thompson's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 25 Feb 1993
Hearing Date(s): 06 May 1991