skip to content

Thompson, Carly Ann

CPSO#: 87924

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46611 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carly Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson ( CPSO# 87924 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARLY ANN THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 24 Dec 2007 to 06 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009