skip to content

Thompson, Bridget Elizabeth

CPSO#: 87069

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2647 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa ON  K1V 7T5
Phone: 613-421-6388 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bridget Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Thompson ( CPSO# 87069 )

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8

Business Address:
2647 Alta Vista Drive
Suite 316
Ottawa ON  K1V 7T5
Phone Number: (613) 680-8747

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIDGET ELIZABETH THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010