skip to content

Thomas, Wendy Marie

CPSO#: 87914

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
be well centre
302-459 George St N.
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R6
Phone: (705) 304-1143
Fax: (705) 243-6424 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Thomas ( CPSO# 87914 )

Business Address:
Turnbull Medical Building
Suite 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 872-4353

Business Address:
459 George St N
Peterborough ON  K9H 3R6
Phone Number: 7053041143

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WENDY MARIE THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009