skip to content

Thomas, Richard David

CPSO#: 32107

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Dec 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huronia Medical Centre
P O Box 790
Suite 103
104 Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-8482
Fax: (705) 526-8789 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard D. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Thomas ( CPSO# 32107 )

Business Address:
Huronia Medical Centre
103 - 104 Penetanguishene Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-8482

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Dec 2019 Active
             As from December 6, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard David
            Thomas, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Thomas to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. RICHARD DAVID THOMAS
                                          ("Dr. Thomas")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Thomas, certificate of registration number 32107, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that following a public complaint and
                  Registrar's investigation that raised concerns about my standard of
                  practice in family medicine, I underwent remediation and submitted to a
                  reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently
                  received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice in
                  family medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        a minimum of six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a
                              minimum of the first three (3) months ("Moderate Level
                              Supervision"). Upon receiving permission to transition to low
                              level supervision, the frequently of visits will be no less
                              than monthly for a minimum of a further three (3) months
                              ("Low Level Supervision");
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the Assessor
                        received August 7, 2019 and Assessor's Addendum dated September 5,
                        2019, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Course: Safer Opioid Prescribing Series, The University of
                              Toronto;
                  
                        (ii)  Course: Practising Wisely:  Reducing Unnecessary Testing and
                              Treatment;
                  
                        (iii) Course: Cervical Cancer - CME e-Module;
                  
                        (iv)  Course: 69th Annual Refresher Course in Family Medicine;
                  
                        (v)   Course: Documentation: Charting Medical Records eLearning
                              Module, CMPA;
                  
                  
                        (vi)  Course: Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record
                              Keeping eLearning Module, CMPA;
                  
                        (vii) Review, reflect and discuss the following with my Clinical
                              Supervisor:
                  
                              1.    2018 Diabetes Guideline, Diabetes Canada;
                  
                              2.    2018 Hypertension Canada Prevention and Treatment
                                    Guidelines, Hypertension Canada;
                  
                              3.    Management of Chronic Non-Cancer Pain Tool, Centre for
                                    Effective Practice;
                  
                              4.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain, Michael G. DeGroote National Pain
                                    Centre;
                  
                              5.    Prescribing Drugs, CPSO;
                  
                              6.    Managing Benzodiazepine Use in Older Adults, Centre for
                                    Effective Practice;
                  
                              7.    Depression:  Screening and Diagnosis, American Family
                                    Physician;
                  
                              8.    Guidelines for Healthcare Providers to Promote Low-Risk
                                    Drinking among Patients; 
                  
                              9.    Medical Records, CPSO;
                  
                        (viii)Review, reflect and prepare a written summary, to be
                              discussed with my Clinical Supervisor, of: Cannabis for
                              Medical Purposes, CPSO; 
                  
                        (ix)  Any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to register for and complete the required
                        courses at the first opportunity and the self-study components
                        within four (4) months of signing this Undertaking.
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thomas, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thomas, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint and Registrar's investigation
                              that raised concerns about Dr. Thomas' standard of practice
                              in family medicine, Dr. Thomas underwent remediation and
                              submitted to a practice reassessment. The subsequent
                              reassessment report raised concerns about Dr. Thomas'
                              standard of practice in family medicine. As a result:
                  
                              Dr. Thomas will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 6 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Thomas will engage in professional education in:
                  
                              Type 2 Diabetes management
                  
                              Arterial hypertension management
                  
                              Opioid and benzodiazepine prescribing
                  
                              Management of patients with mental health disorders
                  
                              Evidence-based investigation selection and related patient
                              counselling
                  
                              Care of patients using/abusing cannabis and/or alcohol
                  
                              Medical record keeping
                  
                              Dr. Thomas's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thomas, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Thomas, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Thomas, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Thomas, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard David Thomas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 6, 2019:

Following a public complaint and Registrar’s investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Thomas’ standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Thomas underwent remediation and submitted to a practice reassessment. The subsequent reassessment report raised concerns about Dr. Thomas’ standard of practice in family medicine. As a result:

Dr. Thomas will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least 6 months.

Dr. Thomas will engage in professional education in:

Type 2 Diabetes management

Arterial hypertension management

Opioid and benzodiazepine prescribing

Management of patients with mental health disorders

Evidence-based investigation selection and related patient counselling

Care of patients using/abusing cannabis and/or alcohol

Medical recordkeeping

Dr. Thomas’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 20, 2019, Dr. Thomas has completed all components of his SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)