skip to content

Thomas, Peter

CPSO#: 28025

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thomas ( CPSO# 28025 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2020