skip to content

Thomas, Jisha Michell

CPSO#: 100807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Jun 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:New York College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bur Oaks Pediatrics
Unit C-10
50 Bur Oak Ave
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone: (416) 235-1757 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J M Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomas ( CPSO# 100807)

Business Address:
Markham Pediatric Centre
Unit C-10
50 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 235-1757

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015 Active
             Dr.  Jisha Michell Thomas may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics in
            an office based setting only.

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.