skip to content

Thomas, Isabelle Marie Beatrice

CPSO#: 85909

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



France

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 28, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Isabelle Marie Beatrice Thomas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 28, 2016:

Dr. Thomas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.