skip to content

Thomas, Anthony Dorrien

CPSO#: 28057

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 4 54 Auburn Street Peterborough, ON K9H 2G2
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Feb 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016