skip to content

Bell, Thomas Albert Botly

CPSO#: 50134

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 08 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
66 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Phone: 416 922-2868 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thomas A.B. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2008
Corporation Name: Thomas A.B. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2010
Corporation Name: Thomas A.B. Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:25 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Jun 2021
Summary:

On June 7, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, via videoconference, 
an allegation of Dr. Bell’s professional misconduct. Dr. Bell had issued 11 prescriptions 
for a family member, including some for narcotics, benzodiazepines, and opioid 
analgesics. Dr. Bell did not bill OHIP for services to this person, or keep medical records 
respecting them. An assessor retained by the College to review the matter opined that 
Dr. Bell contravened College policy by treating a family member in non-emergency 
situations. The assessor also opined that Dr. Bell failed to meet the standard of practice 
of the profession in his treatment of this person.  
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Bell and his counsel, and counsel for the 
College. Dr. Bell admitted the facts and admitted that he had engaged in professional 
misconduct. On the basis of the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the 
Committee found that Dr. Bell committed an act of professional misconduct under: 
   -  paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
      1991 in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
      medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
      regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
   -  paragraph 1(1)2 of O.Reg. 856/93, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
      practice of the profession in his care of patients. 
 
Disposition 
 
Taking into account an Agreed Statement of Facts (Penalty) and the joint submission on 
penalty, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   •  Dr. Bell attend before the Committee to be reprimanded; 
   •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Bell’s certificate of registration for three months 
   •  The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bell’s certificate of 
      registration, as set out in the Order 
   •  Dr. Bell pay costs to the College of $6,000. 
 
The Committee’s reasons for decision will be available for review on the College’s 
website, upon release.

Hearing Date(s): June 7, 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)