skip to content

Thirlwell, Michael Patrick

CPSO#: 22651

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health cCentre
1001 Decarie Boulevard
DO2.7323
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 53333
Fax: (514) 934-8379

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PATRICK THIRLWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRLWELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1970