skip to content

Thind, Harpreet Kaur

CPSO#: 93126

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Wellness Centre
McMaster University
PGCLL 210/201-1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 27700
Fax: 905-546-0805 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sheridan Campus Health Services
Davis Campus
Room C210 - 7899 McLaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 874-4409
Fax: (905) 874-4388
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARPREET KAUR THIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012