skip to content

Thind, Amritpal Singh

CPSO#: 95934

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Singh, Amritpal (used until: 19 Mar 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
366 Main Street North
Suite 201
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: 905 455 1455 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Christian Homes
7900 McLaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5A7
Canada
Phone: (905) 459-3333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amritpal Singh Thind Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thind ( CPSO# 95934 )

Business Address:
201 - 366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1455

Business Address:
7900 McLaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 459-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMRITPAL SINGH THIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013