skip to content

Thiele, Allison Theresa

CPSO#: 92650

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Apr 2010 to 08 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2013 to 22 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Mar 2013