Thevakumaran, Dharini (CPSO#: 99460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Healthcare
300 Rossland Road East Unit 105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-4664
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHARINI THEVAKUMARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEVAKUMARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2014