skip to content

Therien, Genevieve

CPSO#: 85622

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
EL - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2008