skip to content

Theobald, Geoffrey Mann

CPSO#: 18837

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NATIONAL HOME DOCTOR
505 Consumers Road Suite 901`
Toronto ON  M2J 4V8
Phone: 416 631 3000
Fax: 416 631 0613 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey M. Theobald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Theobald ( CPSO# 18837 )

Business Address:
901 - 505 Consumers Road
Toronto ON  M2J 4V8
Phone Number: (416) 631-3000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY MANN THEOBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEOBALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1969