skip to content

Theng, Pei Shih

CPSO#: 86169

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Centre
387 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Phone: (519) 426-4821 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.  Pei  Shih  Theng  may  practice medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.