skip to content

Tharmalingam, Senthuran

CPSO#: 95788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Cottman Ave

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 5, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 6, 2016, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Senthuran Tharmalingam's privileges were reinstated at Kingston General Hospital, Hotel Dieu Hospital and Providence Care, effective May 6, 2016.

On February 8, 2016, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Senthuran Tharmalingam's privileges were temporarily suspended at Kingston General Hospital, Hotel Dieu Hospital and Providence Care, effective February 5, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:09 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SENTHURAN THARMALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2021

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 21, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)