skip to content

Thanendran, Amudhinie

CPSO#: 101312

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawes Family Practice and Walk-in
2772 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L7
Phone: 416 690 1042
Fax: 416 690 1046 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cliffwood Family Practice & Walk In
3891 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M2H 2S7
Canada
Phone: (647) 532-7572
Fax: (416) 493-0707
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amudhinie Thanendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thanendran ( CPSO# 101312)

Business Address:
Cliffwood Family Practice & Walk In
3891 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M2H 2S7
Phone Number: (647) 532-7572

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMUDHINIE THANENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015