skip to content

Thamilvaanan, Shanthi

CPSO#: 97508

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 977-8899
Fax: (519) 977-8866 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

3840 Howard Aven
Roseland After hours Medical Clinic
Windsor ON  N9E3N9
Canada
Phone: 5199723944
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Thamilvaanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thamilvaanan ( CPSO# 97508 )

Business Address:
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone Number: (519) 977-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Jul 2020 Active
             As from July 6, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Shanthi Thamilvaanan
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Thamilvaanan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SHANTHI THAMILVAANAN
                                          ("Dr. Thamilvaanan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                   "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, certificate of registration number 97508, am a
                  member of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that following a public complaint that
                  raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, I
                  agreed to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report
                  subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my medical
                  record-keeping.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   CMPA's e-module on Documentation: Principles of Medical
                              Record Keeping; 
                  
                        (ii)  Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following
                              policies:            
                              1.    Medical Records Management, College Policy;
                  
                              2.    Medical Records Documentation, College Policy.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to complete this requirement within
                        three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by
                        that time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed
                        above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by
                        the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion
                        whether substitution is appropriate.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake that, approximately twelve (12)
                        months after the completion of the Professional Education set out
                        in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen
                        (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me,
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the
                        College. 
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location at which I practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any
                        Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice
                        Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.
                        Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and
                        all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr.
                              Thamilvaanan's standard of practice in family medicine, she
                              agreed to a reassessment of her practice. The reassessment
                              report subsequently received by the College raised concerns
                              about her medical record-keeping. As a result, Dr.
                              Thamilvaanan will engage in professional education in
                              record-keeping and submit to a further reassessment of her
                              practice. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to any person who requires this
                  information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led
                  to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Thamilvaanan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs
                  of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another,
                  any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; 
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Shanthi Thamilvaanan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 6, 2020:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Thamilvaanan’s standard of practice in family medicine, she agreed to a reassessment of her practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about her medical record-keeping. As a result, Dr. Thamilvaanan will engage in professional education in record-keeping and submit to a further reassessment of her practice.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)