skip to content

Thakrar, Amar

CPSO#: 85955

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Brock 2
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2250
Fax: (613) 544-7250 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L1W0
Canada
Phone: (705) 658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. A. Thakrar and J. Dudebout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dudebout ( CPSO# 85945 )
Dr. A. Thakrar ( CPSO# 85955 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Centre Of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Brock 2
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
PO Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 658-4544

Business Address:
LACGH
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMAR THAKRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKRAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 19 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009