skip to content

Tessier, Carole Rolande Marie

CPSO#: 91478

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Jail
2550 Trout Lake Road
North Bay ON  P1B 7S7
Phone: (705)472-8115 Ext. 220
Fax: (705) 472-1710 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hôpital de Témiscamingue-Kipawa
180, Anvik
Témiscamingue QC  J0Z 3R0
Canada
Phone: 819-627-3385
Fax: 819-627-9497
County: 
Electoral District: 

Pavillon Sainte-Famille
Hôpital de Ville-Marie
22 Notre-Dame Nord
Ville-Marie QC  J9V 1W8
Canada
Phone: 819-629-2420
Fax: 819-629-3069
County: 
Electoral District: 

Nipissing First Nation Health Serv.
58 Semo Road
Garden Village ON  P2B 3K2
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3312
Fax: (705) 753-5087
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

CISSS de l'Abitibi-Témiscamingue
632, 1ère Rue ouest
Amos QC  J9T 2N2
Canada
Phone: 819-732-3271 Ext. 4430
Fax: 819-732-1784
County: 
Electoral District: 

CMHA
20 May Street
New Liskeard
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: 705-647-4444 Ext. 3345
Fax: 705-647-4434
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

CMHA
5 Kirkland Street East
Kirkland Lake
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 1N9
Canada
Phone: 705-567-9596 Ext. 4234
Fax: 705-567-5271
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Tessier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tessier ( CPSO# 91478 )

Business Address:
West Nipissing Family Health Team
172 Ethel Street
Box E1
Suite 4
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 753-5775

Business Address:
West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
Mattawa General Hospital
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Business Address:
CMHA New Liskeard
20 May Street South
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-4444

Business Address:
Hearst/Kapuskasing Counselling Services
29 Byng Avenue
Suite 1
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 1W6
Phone Number: (705) 335-8468

Business Address:
North Bay Jail
2550 Trout Lake Road
North Bay ON  P1B 7S7
Phone Number: (705) 472-8115

Business Address:
Programme Psychiatrique Fancophone du
Nord de l-Ontario
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 715-5829

Business Address:
Hopital de Temiscamingue-Kipawa
180 Anvik
Temiscamingue QC  J0Z 3R0
Phone Number: (819) 627-3385

Business Address:
Pavillon Sainte-Famille Hopital de Ville-Marie
22 Notre Dame Nord
Ville-Marie QC  J9V 1W8
Phone Number: (819) 629-2420


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLE ROLANDE MARIE TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2011 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2014