skip to content

Tessier, Alisha Kathleen

CPSO#: 91122

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
19 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mills, Alisha Kathleen (used until: 20 Dec 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 550 Byrne Road Yellowknife, NT X1A 2N1
Date Received: 04 Aug 2015


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 May 2021