skip to content

Tesluk, Raymond Paul

CPSO#: 21401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Jul 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: 1-888-563-3732 or 416-781-9083 Ext. 1
Date Received: 21 Oct 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 11 Jul 2014 Active
             As from July 11, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raymond Paul Tesluk,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tesluk to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Tesluk's practice is restricted to working as a surgical assistant.